Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Baeza, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Proof of Service
Date: November 15, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 29, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 29, 2022Judgment Received
Date: April 29, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 29, 2022Request for Default Received
Date: April 29, 2022Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)
Date: April 29, 2022Civil case cover sheet
Date: September 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 29, 2022Civil Complaint filed
Date: September 30, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: October 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
04/29/22- Declaration Re: Waiver of Interest and Attorney Fees. Declaration Filed Re: Fees |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
04/29/22- Declaration Re: Non Military Status Declaration Filed Re: Non Military Status |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
04/29/22- Proposed Order Judgment Received Forward to Dept 404 on 05/09/22 |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Re: 585 Declaration Filed Re: 585 |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
04/29/22- Request for Entry of Default Request for Default Received Without Judgment |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
04/29/22- Request for Dismissal DOES 1-5 Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s) Without Prejudice Does: 1-5 |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
04/29/22- Declaration Re: 1033 Declaration Filed Re: 1033 |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
POS_eABC_Proof_95840491 Proof of Service |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.