Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Hinojosa, Judy, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Reduced Fee |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/22/2021-Declaration in Support Declaration Filed Declaration in Support |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/22/2021-Request for Dismissal Dismissal Not Entered Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Previously entered |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/22/2021-Judicial Notice Declaration Filed Judicial Notice |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/22/2021-Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 Declaration Filed Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/22/2021-Request for Entry of Default Request to Enter Default |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
11/22/2021- Judgment Received Judgment Received Forwarded to Dept 404 on 11/30/2021 |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s) Without Prejudice Does: 1-10 |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default Request to Enter Default Denied Item #8: date of mailing must be on or before the date of the declaration of penalty of perjury, not after. |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.