Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gomez, Macedonio, filed a(n) 42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) case against Mohammad Gill, Ayaz, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Negin, Stephanie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
Category42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: September 03, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 09, 2022Notice Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 02, 2022Order Granted
Date: November 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Via Courtcall Esmeraldo Zendejas |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Appeared in Person | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Enforce Settlement Patrick McManaman - Filed 01/18/23 Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Order on Remote Appearance Emailed to: ezendejas@dir.ca |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
2-23-23 [Proposed] Judgment - HRG 3/2/2023 Judgment Received PENDING HEARING [Proposed] Judgment |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
2-23-23 Notice of Modification of Hearing Date for Motion to Enforce Settlement - HRG 3/2/23 Notice of Hearing Notice of Modification of Hearing Date for Motion to Enforce Settlement |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work - Notice of Remote Appearance
Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
2/22/2023 Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted Party: Gomez, Macedonio Type of Appearance Requested: CourtCall Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
2/17/23 - Notice of Remote Appearance Notice of Remote Appearance. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.