Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Smith, Candace, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against The City Of Fresno, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
Category40 Unlimited - Mass Tort |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Fresno. The case involves personal property damage and wrongful death. The plaintiff is seeking damages for various causes of action, including motor vehicle negl...
Civil Complaint filed
Date: August 31, 2021Amendment filed
Date: December 07, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 02, 2021Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing
Date: September 10, 2021Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed
Date: September 02, 2021Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing
Date: March 04, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: December 10, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: December 10, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 10, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: September 02, 2021Amendment filed
Date: September 09, 2021Decl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day extension
Date: November 23, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 02, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 19, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 21, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Request to Enter Default Denied
Date: January 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
General Motion Filed 12/10/21 ~ Vaxatious litigant ~ Travis Stokes Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
May 18, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Smith v. The City of Fresno Superior Court Case No. 21CECG02584 Hearing Date: May 18, 2022 (Dept. 502) Motion: By Defendant to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant Tentative Ruling: To grant. (C... | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
4/19/22 Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion Notice Filed City of Fresno's Notice of Non-Opposition to City's Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing Motion for Peremptory Challenge |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
1/4/22 Request to Enter Default Denied Request to Enter Default Denied No Proof of services on file for 1st and 2nd Amended Complaint. #1.a. does not match court records. #1.a. does not match court records, Clerk cannot determine what you are requesting because #1.d. & 1.e. are bot marked & #6.b is incomplete. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
12/15/21 Case Management Statement Case Management Statement Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.