Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Amezola, Melissa, Cabrera, Vanessa, Valenzuela, Rachel, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Emerzian Chiropractic Professional Corporation, Emerzian, John H., San Joaquin Totalcare, Inc., Total Care Management Group, Inc., Total Care Medical Group, Inc., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
Category15 Unlimited - Other Employment |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 29, 2021Stipulation Signed and Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Civil Complaint filed
Date: July 26, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 14, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: March 23, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: May 23, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 27, 2021Answer Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: July 27, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: July 26, 2021Association of Attorney filed
Date: September 14, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: February 03, 2023Stipulation and Order filed
Date: February 08, 2023Amended Document Filed
Date: October 03, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: October 07, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: October 10, 2022Order Signed and Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: September 02, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 31, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: September 30, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Valenzuela v. Emerzian Chiropractic Professional Corporation, et al. Superior Court Case No. 21CECG02138 Hearing Date: November 28, 2023 (Dept. 501) Motion: by Plaintiffs for Preliminary Class Set... | |
September 21, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Valenzuela v. Emerzian Chiropractic Professional Corporation Superior Court Case No. 21CECG02138 Hearing Date: September 21, 2023 (Dept. 501) Motion: by Plaintiffs for Preliminary Approval of Clas... | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order filed continuing CMC from 02/16/23 to 07/18/23 Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
2/3/23 - Proposed Order Cont CMC Order Received for Signature ** Order signed** Forwarded to Dept: 501 [Proposed] Joint Stip to Cont CMC |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
2/3/23 - Answer to First Amended Answer Filed to Amended Complaint |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed moving the cmc from 02/15/22 to 2/16/23 |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order filed to Continue CMC to 02/15/23 Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.