Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tuck, James, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Fresno Unified School District, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Brickey, Gabriel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrickey, Gabriel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2021 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 12, 2021Petition - Writ of Mandate
Date: May 03, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Mandate Briefing Schedule Ryan Griffith Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service for FUSD Proof of Service By: Email Date: 5/11/2021 Document(s): Petition for Writ of Mandate, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Summons, Notice of Judicial Assignment |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment Judicial Disqualification 170.1 & 170.3 |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Case reassigned to Judge Brickey |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self and 170.3 Judge Mark E. Cullers |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
FHS SIGNED CIVIL COVER Civil case cover sheet |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUM100 Summons Summons issued and filed |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CV-47 Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes Notice Filed Assignment of Judge for all Purposes |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
FHS BROWN ACT PETITION Petition - Writ of Mandate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.