Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pantaleon, Andrew, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Gonzalez, Bonifacio, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint document does not provide any specific information regarding dollar amounts or violations of statutes. The text appears to be a form with various fields to be filled out. It includes sections for names, descriptions, and dates related ...
Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 16, 2021Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed
Date: August 09, 2021Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received
Date: August 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 10, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: May 10, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: August 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Conditional Settlement Reached
Date: August 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minors Compromise Document - Underlying Case From Chambers Minute Order |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minors Compromise Document - Underlying Case Order on deposit money into blocked account signed by Judge McGuire. |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minors Compromise Document - Underlying Case Forwarded to: RA Order Approving Compromise of Minors Comp |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minors Compromise Document - Underlying Case Petition for Minor's Compromise |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minors Compromise Document - Underlying Case Forwarded to: RA Order to Deposit Funds Into Blocked Account |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185 Notice of Hearing Notice of Dismissal Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.