Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Flickner, Julie Ann, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Steagall, Hanna Maxine, Steagall, Rocky Lane, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Kristi Culver Kapetan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Julie Ann Flickner against Hannah Maxine Steagall, Rocky Lane Steagall, and Does 1 to 25. The jurisdiction of the case is an unlimited civil case, meaning the amou...
Notice of Hearing
Date: March 02, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: February 09, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: February 11, 2021Answer Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Association of Attorney filed
Date: April 02, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 28, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 13, 2021Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 08, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: February 08, 2021Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted
Date: January 06, 2023Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 06, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Order Regarding Remote Appearance Denied
Date: January 06, 2023ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Req By both: 5-7 Days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted Adjuster: Kyle Bistline Type of Appearance Granted: CourtCall Emailed to: brooke.washburn@libertymutual Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment & CM (re Ex Parte to Continue Trial - filed 1/5/23) |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Remote Appearance Denied Attorney: Brooke E. Washburn Type of Appearance Requested: CourtCall Emailed to: brooke.washburn@libertymutual Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
01/05/23 Order Received for Signature Order Received for Signature *see 1/6/23 MO* Forwarded to Dept:403 (Proposed) Order Continuing Trial and Related Deadlines |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
01/05/23 Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities Ex parte application for an order continuing trial and all related deadlines and events (CCP 599): Memorandum of Points and Authorities. HRG: 01/17/23 |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
01/05/23 Declaration Declaration Filed of Brooke Washburn |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work - Notice of Remote Appearance
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.