Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jackson, John, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kathy Ciuffini presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryChange Of Name And Gender |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Change of Name
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Objection | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Objection | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to Conform Gender |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.