Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jaramillo, Alfred Ronald, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kathy Ciuffini presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Change of Name
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name (Change of Name) | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Change of Name
Judge: Dougherty, Frank |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Documents with Reason(s) | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name (Change of Name) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.