Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Declue Jenny, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jonathan L. Rosenbloom presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Guardianship Review Hearing |
|
November 02, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Authority Hearing (Guardianship) |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition - Terminate Guardianship Person Only Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Guardianship Review Hearing - Held Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
November 17, 2022 | Hearing |
Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Guardianship Review Hearing |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Guardianship Status Report Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Appointing Guardian (Person Only ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.