Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
1250916 Ontario Ltd., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Dorenfeld David K., Mazarei Mazyar Hassan, against Kagan Safaa Idyouss, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2021 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: SAFAA IDYOUSS KAGAN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 29, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 29, 2021Complaint
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 30, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 27, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: March 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER FAILURE TO APPEAR)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: June 13, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: August 12, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: August 30, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 20, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/20/2022
Date: September 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: November 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE AND FA...)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Serve and Fa...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal after failure to appear)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by 1250916 ONTARIO LTD. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/27/2022)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.