Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Steffen Jr, Edwin Albert, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with Timothy S. Healy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition - After Letters Issued | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for probate full/ltd authority (bond?) | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.