Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Burrill, Crystal, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Jansen, Allison, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with David M. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Received from | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Sent to | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Objection - No Fee | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Sent to | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.