Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Morris, Kriston, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategorySpousal/Domestic Partner Property (Pr13650) |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Petition - Spousal or Domestic Partnership Property -PR13650
Date: May 28, 2021Petition Hearing
Date: June 29, 2021Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Hearing - Probate
Date: June 11, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 29, 2021Order-Spousal Property
Date: July 02, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: July 08, 2021Order
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
July 02, 2021 |
Order on Spousal Property Order-Spousal Property Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
June 30, 2021 |
DENIED - Spousal Property Order Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
June 29, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
The petition is granted. Petitioner shall submit a form of order.
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Petition Hearing Spousal Property Petition Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 29, 2021 |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
||
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate The petition is granted. Petitioner shall submit a form of order. |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate NOH |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Spousal/Domestic Partnership Property Petition - Spousal or Domestic Partnership Property -PR13650 |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Probate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.