Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigative Report Filed | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Conservator Party: Petitioner Rattie, Marites Salvador |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Counsel | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigative Report Filed | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Form Filed | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent / Nomination / Waiver (GC-211) | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed - Probate / Mental Health | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.