Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Zamora, Sharon, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate-Probate & Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Waiver of Accounting on 1st & Final Report; Final Distribution Absent objection, the matter will be approved.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
October 28, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Waiver of Accounting on 1st & Final Report; Final Distribution
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Accounting on Final Report; Allowance of Statutory Compensation; Final Distribution Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed -HRG: 10/28/21 |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Accounting, Filed on Final Report; Allowance of Statutory Compensation; Final Distribution -HRG: 10/28/21 |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Law and Motion Subsequent Waiver of Accounting |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver, Filed of Account -Janelle Ramirez |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Inventory & Appraisal, Filed | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters, Filed Testamentary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.