Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Small, Troy, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate-Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: Judge Colleen K. Sterne |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Probate, Filed -Appointing Administrator -HRG: 3/11/21 |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters, Filed of Administration |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Supervision Begins Appointment of Personal Representative | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Petition Letters Administration Granted |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition: Letters Administration
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative, Filed -HRG: 3/11/21 |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative, Filed | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication, Filed | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Notice of Petition to Admin Estate, Filed -HRG: 3/11/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.