Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carrillo, Maria filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Mendocino County. This case was filed in Mendocino County Superior Courts Superior with Brennan, Clayton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMendocino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Internal Review Annual Review Judge: Brennan, Clayton |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Review Status Judge: Brennan, Clayton |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order After Judicial Review Judicial Investigation Review and Fee Assessment |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Probate Conservatorship Investigation Fees Waived | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
MPB-210 Personalized List of Conservatee's Rights Statement of Rights |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
08/24/2023 MINUTES *Review Annual Judicial Review Judge: Brennan, Clayton |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Investigative Report *Investigative Report - Initial Report **Confidential** Investigator's Report |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Investigative Report - Initial Report **Confidential** Medical Information **Judge Only** |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned To : Jason Babcock order re: judicial investigation returned to sender attempted-not known unable to forward |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only
Judge: Brennan, Clayton |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.