Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Scherman, Sherry C, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship - Estate |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status of Accounting
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 06, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: 1st & Final Accounting & Report, Discharge of Conservator Absent objection, the matter will be approved. An order is needed.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
1st & Final Accounting Directing Delivery of Assets; Discharge of Conservator Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 28, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: 1st & Final Accounting & Report; Discharge of Conservator
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
October 28, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: 1st & Final Accounting & Report; Discharge of Conservator Deficiency: Summary of Account does not match the Inventory & Appraisal; Transactions before and after the ...
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
1st & Final Accounting ;Directing Delivery of Assets; Discharge of Conservator Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review: Investigator's Report - 6 mo Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review: Investigator's Report
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Notice of Hearing, Filed -HRG 10/28/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.