Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Strohlein, Desiree M, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Brown, John R, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Clare Keithley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClare Keithley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expires 9/1/2026 Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Request for Restraining Order; 08/12/2021 Judge: Keithley, Clare |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order as to Respondent | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.