Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gallegos, Patricia Ann, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Saltalamacchia, Thomas Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLean, Sandra L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expired 4/21/22 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
||
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 1-28-2021 Temporary Order Partially Granted; Continued from 4/7/21 for Service Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing DV116
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 1-28-2021 Temporary Order Partially Granted, Continued by Petitioner's Request Due to a Medical Emergency from 3-3-2021 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing DV116
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filed 1-28-21 Temporary Orders Partially Granted, Reissued from 2-17-21 for Respondent to File a Response Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.