Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dunlap, Felicia, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Singer, Blakeslee Barnes, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with McLean, Sandra L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 | Proof of Mailing | ||
February 03, 2021 |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
||
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner's Request for a Restraining Order; 01/12/2021 -Temporary Orders Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 02, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Restraining Order | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Firearms Turned In, Sold or Stored | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order Proof of Service of the Temporary Restraining as to Respondent |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.