Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Sushovan Datta, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Oindrila Bal, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned/Undeliverable Mail | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Trial Brief | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement: Settlement Conference | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned/Undeliverable Mail | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.