Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pelter, Tara, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cervantes, Nicolas, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Robert Stamps presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Stamps Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Proof of Father's Anger Management Classes Judge: Stamps, Robert |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Proof of Father's Anger Management Classes Judge: Stamps, Robert |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Court to Respondent |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreement: Mediation Signed Full Agreement Regarding Custody and Visitation |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreement: Mediation Proposed Full Agreement Regarding Custody and Visitation |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment
Judge: Miller, Beth, MA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.