Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Los Angeles, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Retano Tanya Lisette, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 46 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 DSU - MTN (Initial Hearing) |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
DSU - Stipulation for Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
DSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) (-Judgment-Child Support-Health Care-Parentage ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DSU - Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.