Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Victory, Anita, Victory, Jaime, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Draganov, Bronislav Milan, Fagel, Bruce G, against Lee, Louis C., Lee, Louis C., Md, Watsonville Hospital Corporation A Delaware Corporation, represented by Cowden, Marc, Stoddard, Adam Michael, Tabari, Cyrus, Wagster, Jennifer Ann, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
Category(45) Unlimited Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
52611Notic008117
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Change of Firm name and Address
Date: March 08, 2022SF183175.Notice_of_Entry_and_Dismissal
Date: January 09, 2024SF178325.RFD
Date: December 06, 2023RA-010 NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE CAT 8.3.22
Date: July 30, 202261291Notic00d251
Date: August 02, 202261347Notic009f2b
Date: August 03, 202266460CaseM002c2e
Date: November 16, 2022Victory CMC Stmt - Watsonville
Date: November 16, 202267380Notic000028
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance (Hearing 12.7.22)
Date: December 06, 2022CMS (hearing 3.7.23)
Date: February 17, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance 3.7.23
Date: March 04, 202371920CaseM01c1dd
Date: March 06, 202371920Notic001438
Date: March 06, 202371990Notic00c12c
Date: March 07, 2023Notice Change of Law Firm and Address
Date: August 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | SF183175.Notice_of_Entry_and_Dismissal | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SF178325 | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of Address / Residence Notice Filed | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Change of Law Firm and Address | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Party: Plaintiff VICTORY, ANITA; Plaintiff VICTORY, JAIME |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | 71990Notic00c12c | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff VICTORY, ANITA; Plaintiff VICTORY, JAIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.