Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Abdolhosseini, Tina H, against L&A Popov Enterprises, Popov, Andrey, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Management Conference
Date: February 09, 2022Complaint
Date: August 19, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: August 19, 2021Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: August 19, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 19, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: May 11, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 11, 2022Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: September 21, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 10, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: August 10, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 25, 2022Order to Show Cause - Court Issued
Date: August 25, 2022Order to Show Cause - Predisposition
Date: October 12, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: October 12, 2022Minute Order
Date: January 18, 2023Minute Order
Date: October 12, 2022Notice
Date: January 19, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: January 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Order to Show Cause as to Tina Abdolhosseini Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sanctions Imposed Notice |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Court Issued
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Sanctions | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Order to Show Cause as to Tina Abdolhosseini Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.