Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Collins, Rand, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Lefevre, Neil, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Kurt W. Worley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKurt W. Worley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Non-Service Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Orders Denied Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temps Denied Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing CH-116 Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temps Denied Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Civil Harassment
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.