Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nationwide Mutal Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Brisco, David Dewart, against Kraemer & Co Mfg, Inc, Nolin Steeel Erection, Inc, Pass, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company against Nolin Steel Erection, Inc., PASS, Inc., Kraemer & Co. MFG, Inc., and Does 1 to 100. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company alleges that it provided limited insurance coverage to Nort...
Case Management Conference
Date: February 02, 2022Complaint
Date: August 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Pass, Inc Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cross Complaint - No Fee Cross-Complaint for Indemnity, Equitable Contribution and Declaratory Relief |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited Nolin Steel Erection's Answer to Complaint |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed Summons on Nolin Steel Erection's Cross-Complaint |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Norlin Steel Erection, Inc Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Kraemer & Co Mfg Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.