Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brownridge, Lena Elizabeth, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rainsbury, Daniel Lee, against Whole Foods Market California Inc., represented by Blaxter, Jt Wells, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Notice of COA - SERVICE COPY
Date: February 10, 2022Plaintiffs CMC Statement No. 2 FINAL and POS
Date: March 22, 2022WFM's CMC Statement for 4-6-22 - SERVICE COPY
Date: March 22, 2022WFMCA's Notice of Remote App. - SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2022CMC Statement and POS FINAL No. 3_ 8.29.22
Date: August 29, 2022WFM's Notice of Remote App for ENTIRE CASE -
Date: August 29, 2022WFM's CMC Statement for 9-13-22 - SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2022P ENotice of Remote App Entire Case
Date: September 07, 2022Notice of Settlement of Entire Case and POS
Date: December 09, 2022Request for Dismissal FINAL with POS
Date: January 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal FINAL with POS | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case and POS | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | P ENotice of Remote App Entire Case | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CMC Statement and POS FINAL No. 3_ 8.29.22 | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | WFM's Notice of Remote App for ENTIRE CASE - | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | WFM's CMC Statement for 9-13-22 - SERVICE | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | WFMCA's Notice of Remote App. - SERVICE | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs CMC Statement No. 2 FINAL and POS | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | WFM's CMC Statement for 4-6-22 - SERVICE COPY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.