Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jarchow, Michael, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Sladariu, Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temps Granted Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Non-Service Proof of Unsuccessful Service |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temps Granted Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Continue Court Hearing | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Restraining Order Granted Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.