Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ferrara, Nicolas, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kaestner, Jan Eric, against Starbucks Corporation, represented by Baxter, Samuel S, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryLimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC held |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.