Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lizama, Cesar Caudillo, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name, Filed | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed OSC: Name Change: Granted |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication, Filed - publication complete |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication, Filed | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Filed hrg: 4/13/2021 |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Filed | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, Granted/Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.