Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
George Lewbel, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scott Richard Kaufman, against Bmw Of North America, Llc, represented by Kevin Michael Benedicto, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
MEMO
Date: January 12, 2022DEC
Date: January 12, 2022AMENDED Notice to MTCA
Date: January 25, 20222022-01-24 PROPOSED Order Granting Def's MTCA
Date: January 25, 2022Oppo to Def's MTC Arb.Lewbel 03-25-22
Date: March 26, 2022Declaration of SK iso MTC Arb.Lewbel 03-25-22
Date: March 26, 2022POS re OPPO to MTC Arb.Lewbel 03-25-22
Date: March 26, 20222022-04-01_Lewbel_Reply ISO Bmw NA MTCA
Date: April 01, 2022DEC 2
Date: January 12, 2022POS re RFD.Lewbel 01-26-23
Date: January 27, 2023RFD.Lewbel 01-26-23
Date: January 27, 2023MOTION
Date: January 12, 2022CMS
Date: January 11, 2022POS [BV]
Date: January 11, 2022Jury Fee Nt.Lewbel
Date: January 11, 2022CMS.Lewbel.eFile
Date: January 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | POS re RFD.Lewbel 01-26-23 | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RFD.Lewbel 01-26-23 | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal: Full | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-04-01_Lewbel_Reply ISO Bmw NA MTCA | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Zoom Instruction Sheet J. Panetta D14 | |
March 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Oppo to Def's MTC Arb.Lewbel 03-25-22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.