Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Luquan C Aubrey, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Lakisha Norman, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Joscelyn C. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105 updated: Result Date to 03/08/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
On the Complaint filed by Luquan C Aubrey on 11/08/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action Dismissal |
|
March 08, 2022 | Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing | ||
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
CH-120 Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders Filed by: Lakisha Norman (Respondent) Document |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
CH-200 Proof of Personal Service (Civil Harassment) Filed by: Luquan C Aubrey (Petitioner) As to: Lakisha Norman (Respondent) Service Type: Personal Document |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Pending in WQ by: Document |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Temporary Restraining Order Filed by: Clerk As to: Lakisha Norman (Respondent) Document |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse at Department 105 Event |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Joscelyn Jones in Department 105 Wiley W. Manuel Courthouse Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.