Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cerpas Garcia, Juan Manuel, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree, Filed | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication, Filed | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Filed | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name, Filed | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.