Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Raul Miranda-Canales, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Timothy Andrew Gill, against Celso Martinez Sanchez, Gloria Maldonado Monroy, represented by Christopher Ward Rivera, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Miranda-Canales - Request for Dismissal
Date: June 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Miranda-Canales - Request for Dismissal | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal: Full | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Zoom Instruction Sheet sent for D14 | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Court-ordered mediation - case submission | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Zoom Instruction Sheet sent for 15A (Complex/Ex Parte) | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Zoom Instruction Sheet sent for D14 | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.