Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Mental Competency (Pc 1368 & Wic 709) case against Xavier, Russell, represented by Lipperd, Michelle, Prekoski, Stephen James, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Syda K. Cogliati presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSyda K. Cogliati Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 29, 2021 |
CategoryMental Competency (Pc 1368 & Wic 709) |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Hearing
Judge: Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant is not present; appearance waived per PC977 | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Health Assessment and Evaluation Report | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Psychiatrist/Psychologist | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant is Not Present |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.