Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Min, Thomas K, against Garcia, Rosalinda, represented by Andrade, Vincent, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Complaint - Video
Date: March 23, 2021Release Order
Date: March 23, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: May 10, 2021Motion
Date: September 17, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: November 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Foster, David |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order (Amended) Motion Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint: Amended
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demurrer
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Foster, David |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint - Video Judge: Lo, Paul |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.