Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Compton, Misty, against Daniels, Christopher Steven, represented by Coughlin, Michael, Mclean, Todd Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLo, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Preliminary
Date: March 25, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 08, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: April 28, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: May 19, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: June 16, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: July 14, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: September 20, 2021Motion
Date: October 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sentencing Hearing
Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Motion Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Right to Confront And Cross Examine Witnesses | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Right to Trial by Jury Waived | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Preliminary Judge: Kirihara, John |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.