Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Burrola, Darien Shea, represented by Green, Anthony C, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Pre-Preliminary
Date: March 24, 2021Release Order
Date: April 28, 2021Firearms Relinquishment Hearing
Date: May 12, 2021Violation of Probation
Date: September 10, 2021Violation of Probation
Date: September 15, 2021Release Order
Date: September 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Release Order
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Violation of Probation
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Violation of Probation
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Violation of Probation Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Violation of Probation Judge: Breen, Thomas P. |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probation is revoked
Judge: Moranda, David |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: VOP Judge: Moranda, David |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Probation Violation | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Firearms Relinquishment Hearing Judge: Moranda, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.