Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Silveira, Nicole A., against Zavala, Juan, Iii, represented by Meyer, Derek Scott, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Lo, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Complaint - Video
Date: March 17, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: March 24, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: April 02, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: April 16, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: April 19, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: April 30, 2021Pre-Trial Conference
Date: May 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Pre-Trial Conference Judge: Slocum, Steven |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Complaint - Video Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Police Report/Incident Report | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.