Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Morris, Tyler James, represented by Snyder, Thomas R., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probation Sentencing
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | (Non-Compliant) - Probation Officer's Firearm Relinquishment | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Officer's Report | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Chrissakis, Valerie R. |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea of Guilty/No Contest - Misdemeanor Domestic Violence | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.