Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Spinks, Nykee Deanthony, represented by Jenkins, Shani Diane, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Randy L. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandy L. Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Barnes, Steven |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Subpoena Records - Received | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Investigator Fees - Granted | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Application for Investigator Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.