Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jones, Jason Lee, represented by Bartlett, Robert Bailey, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Valerie R. Chrissakis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValerie R. Chrissakis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Remanded Into Custody | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probation Sentencing
Judge: Chrissakis, Valerie R. |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probation Sentencing
Judge: Chrissakis, Valerie R. |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript (Type: Entry of Plea) | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Terms & Conditions of Release Pursuant to Cruz/Vargas Waiver |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.