Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Nietomontes, Luis Clemente, represented by Woodbury, Michael R, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kathy Ciuffini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathy Ciuffini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Probation Officer's Report | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.