Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Zavala Magana, Mario, Jr., represented by Kaelble, Ralph F., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Ciuffini, Kathy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCiuffini, Kathy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: D'Morias, Melissa |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Pretrial Conference
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Investigator Fees - Granted in Part | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Application for Investigator Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.