Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ahmady Rodriguez, Ivan Domingo, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Name Change
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Publication of Order to Show Cause for Change of Name of Ivan Domingo Ahmady Rodriguez on 8/25/2021 |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
clear copy of decree of name change Order Received for Signature Decree Changing Name **PENDING HEARING |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
corrected pet to change name with date added Petition for name change filed |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
fee waiver order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Fee Waiver |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
civil cover sheet with page 2 Civil case cover sheet |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
clear copy of order to show cause Name Change OSC Filed Hearing set on: Date: 10/4/2021 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.