Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chavez, Elvira, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rios, Jasmin Cristal, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryE-Filing: Petition - Harrassment (With Violence) |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing - Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Mutual Stay Away Agreement Follow up hearing set. Date: 8/26/2024 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response filed to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Response by Mail |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service By: Personal Service Date: 6/23/2021 Document(s): Court Findings, TRO, Notice of Hearing, Response Packet |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and TRO Temporary Restraining Order Granted. Date: 8/23/21 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of FW-003 - Order on Court Fee Waiver Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed by Clerk |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.